Mental Math with Tricks and Shortcuts
Subject: Mathematic | Topics: ,

Mental Math with Tricks and Shortcuts

Addition

Technique: Add left to right

326 + 678 + 245 + 567 = 900, 1100, 1600, 1620, 1690, 1730, 1790, 1804, & 1816

Note: Look for opportunities to combine numbers to reduce the number of steps to the solution. This was done with 6+8 = 14 and 5+7 = 12 above. Look for opportunities to form 10, 100, 1000, and etc. between numbers that are not necessarily next to each other. Practice!

 

Multiplication & Squaring

Some useful formulae                                                 Examples

 

(a+b)2 = a2 + 2ab + b2                                                    492 = (40 + 9) 2 = 1600 + 720 + 81 = 2401

(a-b) 2 = a2 –2ab + b2                                                      562 = (60 – 4) 2 = 3600 – 480 + 16 = 3136

(a+b) (a-b) = a2 – b2                                                       64 x 56 = (60 – 4) (60 + 4) = 3600 – 16 = 3584

(a+b) (c+d) = (ac + ad) + (bc + bd)                23 x 34 = (20 + 3) (30 + 4) = 600 + 80 + 90 + 12 = 782

(a+b) (c-d) = (ac – ad) + (bc – bd)                  34 x 78 = (30 + 4) (80 – 2) = 2400 –60 + 320 – 8 = 2652

(a-b) (c-d) = (ac – ad) – (bc – bd)                   67 x 86 = (70 – 3) (90 – 4) = 6300 – 280 – 270 + 12 = 5762

 

X = 1 to 9 & Y = Any Number

(X5) 2 = 100X(X+1) + 25                                652 = 600(7) + 25 = 4200 + 25 = 4225

25 x Y = (Y x 100)/4                                      25 x 76 = 7600/4 = 1900

50 x Y = (Y x 100)/2                                      50 x 67 = 6700/2 = 3350

75 x Y = 3(Y x 100)/4                                    75 x 58 = (5800 x 3)/4 = 17400/4 = 4350

 

Square any Two Digit Number (a = 10’s digit & b = 1’s digit)

(ab)2 = 100a2 + 20(a x b) + b2                                   672 = 100(36) + 20(42) + 49 = 4489

 

Multiply any Two 2 Digit Numbers (a & c = 10’s digit, b & d = 1’a digit)

ab x cd = 100(a x c) + 10[(b x c) + (a x d)] + (b x d)                         53 x 68 = 3000 + 580 + 24 = 3604

 

Tricks using (X5) 2

(X5 – a) 2 = (X5) 2 – X5(2a) + a2)                    632 = (65 – 2) 2 = 4225 – 260 + 4) = 3969

(X5 + a) 2 = (X5) 2 + X5(2a) + a2)                    672 = (65 + 2) 2 = 4225 + 260 + 4) = 4489

 

Squaring Numbers 52 to 99

a2 = [a – (100 – a)]100 + (100 – a) 2                       932 = (93 – 7)100 + 72 = 8649

 

Squaring Numbers 101 to 148

a2 = [a + (a – 100)]100 + (a – 100) 2                     1082 = (108 + 8)100 + 82 = 11664

 

Squaring Numbers near 1000

a2 = [a – (1000 – a)]1000 + (1000 – a) 2              9942 = (994 – 6)1000 + 6 2 = 988036

a2 = [a + (a – 1000)]1000 + (a – 1000) 2             10072 = (1007 + 7)1000 + 72 = 1014049

 

Squaring Numbers that end in 1

a2 = (a – 1) 2 + 2a – 1                                        61 2 = 60 2 + 122 – 1 = 3600 + 121 = 3721

 

Squaring Numbers that end in 4

a2 = (a + 1)2 – (2a + 1)                                      442 = 452 – (88 + 1) = 2025 – 89 = 1936

 

Squaring Numbers that end in 6

a2 = (a – 1)2 + (2a – 1)                                       562 = 552 + 112 – 1 = 3025 + 111 = 3136

 

Squaring Numbers that end in 9

a2 = (a + 1) 2 – (2a + 1)                                     792 = 802 – (158 + 1) = 6400 – 159 = 6341

 

Using Squares to Help Multiply

Two Numbers that Differ by 1

If a > b then a x b = a2 – a                               35 x 34 = 1225 – 35 = 1190

If a < b then a x b = a2 + a                               35 x 36 = 1225 + 35 = 1260

 

Two Numbers that Differ by 2

a x b = [(a + b)/2]2 -1                                       26 x 28 = 272 -1 = 729 – 1 = 728

 

Two Numbers that Differ by 3 (a < b)

a x b = (a + 1)2 + (a – 1)                                  26 x 29 = 272 + 25 = 729 + 25 = 754

 

Two Numbers that Differ by 4

a x b = [(a + b)/2]2 – 4                                     64 x 68 = 662 – 4 = 4356 – 4 = 4352

 

Two Numbers that Differ by 6

a x b = [(a + b)/2]2 – 9                                     51 x 57 = 542 – 9 = 2916 – 9 = 2907

 

Two Numbers that Differ by an Even Number: a < b and c = (b – a)/2

a x b = [(a + b)/2]2 – c2                                                 59 x 67 = 632 – 42 = 3969 – 16 = 3953

Two Numbers that Differ by an Odd Number: a < b and c = [1 + (b – a)]/2

a x b = (a + c)2 – [b + (c –1)2]              79 x 92 = 862 – (92 + 36) = 7396 – 128 = 7268

 

Other Multiplying Techniques

 

Multiplying by 11

a x 11 = a + 10a                                              76 x 11 = 76 + 760 = 836

 

a x 11 = If a > 9 insert a 0 between digits and

add sum of digits x 10                                    76 x 11 = 706 + 130 = 836

 

Multiplying by Other Two Digit Numbers Ending in 1 (X = 1 to 9)

a x X1 = a + X0a                                            63 x 41 = 63 + (40 x 63) = 63 + 2520 = 2583

 

Multiplying with Numbers Ending in 5 (X = 1 to 9)

a x X5 = a/2 x 2(X5)                                       83 x 45 = 41.5 x 90 = 415 x 9 = 3735

 

Multiplying by 15

a x 15 = (a + a/2) x                                          10 77 x 15 = (77 + 38.5) x 10 = 1155

 

Multiplying by 45

a x 45 = 50a – 50a/10                                      59 x 45 = 2950 – 295 = 2655

 

Multiplying by 55

a x 55 = 50a + 50a/10                                                 67 x 55 = 3350 + 335 = 3685

 

Multiplying by Two Digit Numbers that End in 9 (X = 1 to 9)

a x X9 = (X9 + 1)a – a                                    47 x 29 = (30 x 47) – 47 = 1410 – 47 = 1363

 

Multiplying by Multiples of 9 (b = multiple of 9 up to 9 x 9)

a x b = round b up to next highest 0               29 x 54 = 29 x 60 – (29 x 60)/10 = 1740 – 174 = 1566

multiply then subtract 1/10 of result

 

Multiplying by Multiples of 99 (b = multiple of 99 up to 99 x 10)

a x b = round up to next highest 0                  38 x 396 = 38 x 400 – (38 x 400)/100 = 15200 – 152 = 15048

multiply and then subtract 1/100 of result

 

SUBTRACTION

 

Techniques:

1) Learn to calculate from left to right: 1427 – 698 = (800 – 100) + (30 – 10) + 9 = 729

2) Think in terms of what number added to the smaller equals the larger: 785 – 342 = 443 (left to right)

3) Add a number to the larger to round to next highest 0; then add same number to the smaller and subtract:

496 – 279 = (496 + 4) – (279 + 4) = 500 – 283 = 217 (left to right)

4) Add a number to the smaller to round to the next highest 10, 100, 1000 and etc.; then subtract and add

the same number to the result to get the answer: 721 – 587 = 721 – (587 + 13) = (721 – 600) + 13 = 134

5) Subtract a number from each number and then subtract: 829 – 534 = 795 – 500 = 295

 

DIVISION

 

Techniques:                                                    Examples

Divide by parts of divisor one at a time:        1344/24 = (1344/6)/4 = 224/4 = 56

Method of Short Division

340 ————— Remainders (3, 4, and 0 during calculations)

7)1792

256 ———————Answer

 

Divide both divisor and dividend by same number to get a short division problem

                                                     10

972/27 divide both by 9 = 3)108

                                                 36

 

Dividing by 5, 50, 500, and etc.: Multiply by 2 and then divide by 10, 100, 1000, and etc.

365/5 = 730/10 = 73

 

Dividing by 25, 250, 2500, and etc.: Multiply by 4 and divide by 100, 1000, 10000, and etc.

Dividing by 125: Multiply by 8 and then divide by 1000

36125/125 = 289000/1000 = 289

 

It can be divided evenly by:

2 if the number ends in 0, 2, 4, 6, and 8

3 if the sum of the digits in the number is divisible by 3

4 if the number ends in 00 or a 2 digit number divisible by 4

5 if the number ends in 0 or 5

6 if the number is even and the sum of the digits is divisible by 3

7 sorry, you must just try this one

8 if the last three digits are 000 or divisible by 8

9 if the sum of the digits are divisible by 9

10 if the number ends in 0

11 if the number has an even number of digits that are all the same: 33, 4444, 777777, and etc.

11 if, beginning from the right, subtracting the smaller of the sums of the even digits and odd digits

results in a number equal to 0 or divisible by 11:

406857/11 Even = 15 Odd = 15 = 0

1049807/11 Even = 9 Odd = 20 = 11

12 if test for divisibility by 3 & 4 work

15 if test for divisibility by 3 & 5 work

Others by using tests above in different multiplication combinations

 

USE ESTIMATES
Use estimates to check your answers. Get in the habit of doing this for all calculations.

Related Mathematic Paper: